House | 03/28/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-15) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {293127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 11/01/2021 | Pre-filed |