Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (126-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/15/2021 | Pre-filed |