Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (92-41)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
Favorable Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Floor Amendment {213422/1 (Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {393025/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|