Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Floor Amendment {863529/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |