Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {963125/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |