Senate
|
05/29/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (114-20)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {403227/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Floor Amendment {323022/1 (Senator Ellis) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Floor Amendment {803529/1 (Senator Ellis) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Floor Amendment {803529/1 (Senator Ellis)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {743727/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Griffith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {743727/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|