Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (101-35) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {553021/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {543026/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {543026/1 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |