Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (33-14) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (92-40) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {403822/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (31-15) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Floor Amendment {553022/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-32) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {443127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | Reassigned to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |