Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {173425/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {483422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |