House | 04/07/2022 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {583621/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |