Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB782 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5- Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6- Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7-amendment.
85 *sb0782*
96
107 SENATE BILL 782
118 C8 2lr2569
12-SB 896/21 – FIN & B&T CF HB 1424
9+SB 896/21 – FIN & B&T
1310 By: Senators Hester and Rosapepe
1411 Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022
1512 Assigned to: Finance and Budget and Taxation
16-Committee Report: Favorable with amendments
17-Senate action: Adopted
18-Read second time: March 8, 2022
1913
20-CHAPTER ______
14+A BILL ENTITLED
2115
2216 AN ACT concerning 1
2317
2418 Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic Transition 2
2519
2620 FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic 3
2721 Transition; and generally relating to the COVID–19 economic crisis. 4
2822
2923 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 5
3024 That: 6
3125
3226 (a) There is a Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic Transition. 7
3327
3428 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 8
3529
3630 (1) four members of the Senate of Maryland, including members from the 9
3731 Budget and Taxation Committee, the Finance Committee, and the Education, Health, and 10
3832 Environmental Affairs Committee, appointed by the President of the Senate; 11
3933
4034 (2) four members of the House of Delegates, including members from the 12
4135 Appropriations Committee, the Committee on Ways and Means, the Economic Matters 13
4236 Committee, the Health and Government Operations Committee, and the Environment and 14
4337 Transportation Committee, appointed by the Speaker of the House; 15
4438
4539 (3) five members of the business sector, including representatives from the 16
4640 health care industry, cybersecurity industry, restaurant industry, childcare industry, and 17
4741 a multi–industry organization appointed by the Governor; 18
42+
43+ (4) one member of the State nonprofit sector appointed by the Governor; 19
44+
45+ (5) the Secretary of Commerce, or the Secretary’s designee; 20
46+
47+ (6) the Secretary of Labor, or the Secretary’s designee; 21
4848 2 SENATE BILL 782
4949
5050
51- (4) five members of the labor sector, including representatives from the 1
52-health care industry, cybersecurity industry, restaurant industry, childcare industry, and 2
53-multi–industry labor organization, designated by the President of the Maryland State and 3
54-District of Columbia AFL–CIO; 4
51+ (7) the Secretary of Transportation, or the Secretary’s designee; and 1
5552
56- (4) (5) one member of the State nonprofit sector appointed by the Governor; 5
53+ (8) the Secretary of Housing and Community Development, or the 2
54+Secretary’s designee. 3
5755
58- (5) (6) the Secretary of Commerce, or the Secretary’s designee; 6
56+ (c) The President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House shall each appoint 4
57+one of their members as cochair of the Workgroup. 5
5958
60- (6) (7) the Secretary of Labor, or the Secretary’s designee; 7
59+ (d) The Department of Legislative Services shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 6
6160
62- (7) (8) the Secretary of Transportation, or the Secretary’s designee; and 8
61+ (e) The Workgroup: 7
6362
64- (8) (9) the Secretary of Housing and Community Development, or the 9
65-Secretary’s designee. 10
63+ (1) may retain the services of the University of Maryland; and 8
6664
67- (c) The President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House shall each appoint 11
68-one of their members as cochair of the Workgroup. 12
65+ (2) shall be appropriated $500,000 for that purpose. 9
6966
70- (d) The Department of Legislative Services shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 13
67+ (f) A member of the Workgroup: 10
7168
72- (e) The Workgroup: 14
69+ (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 11
7370
74- (1) may retain the services of the University of Maryland; and 15
71+ (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 12
72+Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 13
7573
76- (2) shall be appropriated $500,000 for that purpose. 16
74+ (g) The Workgroup shall make recommendations regarding how the State may 14
75+adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting 15
76+from crises in sectors including: 16
7777
78- (f) A member of the Workgroup: 17
78+ (1) telehealth; 17
7979
80- (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 18
80+ (2) telework; 18
8181
82- (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 19
83-Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 20
82+ (3) online education, from kindergarten to graduate programs; 19
8483
85- (g) The Workgroup shall make recommendations regarding how the State may 21
86-adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting 22
87-from crises in sectors including: 23
84+ (4) childcare; 20
8885
89- (1) telehealth; 24
86+ (5) job creation acceleration; 21
9087
91- (2) telework; 25
88+ (6) unemployment compensation; 22
9289
93- (3) online education, from kindergarten to graduate programs; 26
90+ (7) underemployment; 23
9491
95- (4) childcare; 27
92+ (8) small businesses and entrepreneurship; 24
9693
97- (5) job creation acceleration; 28 SENATE BILL 782 3
94+ (9) tax system modernization; 25
95+
96+ (10) changes in real estate such as office space, retail, residential, rental and 26
97+ownership, and community economic centers; 27 SENATE BILL 782 3
9898
9999
100100
101- (6) unemployment compensation; 1
101+ (11) supply chain management; 1
102102
103- (7) underemployment; 2
103+ (12) small businesses that are not associated with a chain store, commonly 2
104+referred to as “main street businesses”; 3
104105
105- (8) small businesses and entrepreneurship; 3
106+ (13) rebuilding the public health system; and 4
106107
107- (9) tax system modernization; 4
108+ (14) other impacts on public services. 5
108109
109- (10) changes in real estate such as office space, retail, residential, rental and 5
110-ownership, and community economic centers; 6
110+ (h) On or before December 1, 2022, the Workgroup shall submit an interim report 6
111+of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 7
112+2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 8
111113
112- (11) supply chain management; 7
114+ (i) On or before December 1, 2023, the Workgroup shall submit a final report of 9
115+its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 10
116+State Government Article, the General Assembly. 11
113117
114- (12) small businesses that are not associated with a chain store, commonly 8
115-referred to as “main street businesses”; 9
118+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 12
119+1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 13
120+this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 14
121+of no further force and effect. 15
116122
117- (13) rebuilding the public health system; and 10
118-
119- (14) other impacts on public services. 11
120-
121- (h) On or before December 1, 2022, the Workgroup shall submit an interim report 12
122-of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 13
123-2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 14
124-
125- (i) On or before December 1, 2023, the Workgroup shall submit a final report of 15
126-its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 16
127-State Government Article, the General Assembly. 17
128-
129- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 18
130-1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 19
131-this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 20
132-of no further force and effect. 21
133-
134-
135-
136-
137-
138-Approved:
139-________________________________________________________________________________
140- Governor.
141-________________________________________________________________________________
142- President of the Senate.
143-________________________________________________________________________________
144- Speaker of the House of Delegates.