Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713120/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Finance |