Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/17/2021 | Pre-filed |