Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 388 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 388 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 80) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0080* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Motor Vehicle Registration – Exceptions for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island and | |
10 | - | Taylors Island | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 80 | |
11 | + | R4, R5 2lr0497 | |
12 | + | SB 312/21 – JPR (PRE–FILED) CF HB 193 | |
13 | + | By: Senator Eckardt | |
14 | + | Requested: September 17, 2021 | |
15 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 | |
16 | + | Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: February 3, 2022 | |
11 | 20 | ||
12 | - | FOR the purpose of creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for | |
13 | - | golf carts on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, and Taylors Island, | |
14 | - | subject to certain requirements and conditions; authorizing the County Council of | |
15 | - | Dorchester County to designate county highways on which a person may operate a | |
16 | - | golf cart on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, or Taylors Island; and | |
17 | - | generally relating to exceptions to motor vehicle registration requirements for golf | |
18 | - | carts. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
19 | 22 | ||
20 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, | |
21 | - | Article – Transportation | |
22 | - | Section 13–402(a)(1) | |
23 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
24 | - | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
25 | 24 | ||
26 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
27 | - | Article – Transportation | |
28 | - | Section 13–402(c)(12) | |
29 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
30 | - | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
25 | + | Motor Vehicle Registration – Exceptions for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island and 2 | |
26 | + | Taylors Island 3 | |
31 | 27 | ||
32 | - | BY adding to | |
33 | - | Article – Transportation | |
34 | - | Section 21–104.6 | |
35 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
36 | - | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
28 | + | FOR the purpose of creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for 4 | |
29 | + | golf carts on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, and Taylors Island, 5 | |
30 | + | subject to certain requirements and conditions; authorizing the County Council of 6 | |
31 | + | Dorchester County to designate county highways on which a person may operate a 7 | |
32 | + | golf cart on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, or Taylors Island; and 8 | |
33 | + | generally relating to exceptions to motor vehicle registration requirements for golf 9 | |
34 | + | carts. 10 | |
37 | 35 | ||
38 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
39 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
36 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 11 | |
37 | + | Article – Transportation 12 | |
38 | + | Section 13–402(a)(1) 13 | |
39 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 14 | |
40 | + | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 15 | |
40 | 41 | ||
41 | - | Article – Transportation | |
42 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 16 | |
43 | + | Article – Transportation 17 | |
44 | + | Section 13–402(c)(12) 18 | |
45 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 19 | |
46 | + | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 20 | |
42 | 47 | ||
43 | - | ||
48 | + | BY adding to 21 2 SENATE BILL 80 | |
44 | 49 | ||
45 | - | (a) (1) Except as otherwise provided in this section or elsewhere in the | |
46 | - | Maryland Vehicle Law, each motor vehicle, trailer, semitrailer, and pole trailer driven on | |
47 | - | a highway shall be registered under this subtitle. | |
48 | 50 | ||
49 | - | (c) Registration under this subtitle is not required for: Ch. 388 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
51 | + | Article – Transportation 1 | |
52 | + | Section 21–104.6 2 | |
53 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 3 | |
54 | + | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 4 | |
50 | 55 | ||
51 | - | – 2 – | |
56 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 5 | |
57 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 6 | |
52 | 58 | ||
53 | - | (12) A golf cart that is operated on a highway in accordance with [§§ | |
54 | - | 21–104.2 through 21–104.4] § 21–104.2, § 21–104.3, § 21–104.4, OR § 21–104.6 of this | |
55 | - | article; | |
59 | + | Article – Transportation 7 | |
56 | 60 | ||
57 | - | ||
61 | + | 13–402. 8 | |
58 | 62 | ||
59 | - | (A) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION , A PERSON WHO | |
60 | - | OPERATES A GOLF CART ON A COUNTY HIGHWAY ON UPPER HOOPERS ISLAND, | |
61 | - | MIDDLE HOOPERS ISLAND, OR TAYLORS ISLAND, WITHOUT REGISTRATION AS | |
62 | - | AUTHORIZED UNDER § 13–402(C)(12) OF THIS ARTICLE: | |
63 | + | (a) (1) Except as otherwise provided in this section or elsewhere in the 9 | |
64 | + | Maryland Vehicle Law, each motor vehicle, trailer, semitrailer, and pole trailer driven on 10 | |
65 | + | a highway shall be registered under this subtitle. 11 | |
63 | 66 | ||
64 | - | ( | |
67 | + | (c) Registration under this subtitle is not required for: 12 | |
65 | 68 | ||
66 | - | (I) ON A COUNTY HIGHWAY ON WHICH THE MAXIMUM POSTED | |
67 | - | SPEED LIMIT DOES NOT EXCEED 30 MILES PER HOUR ; | |
69 | + | (12) A golf cart that is operated on a highway in accordance with [§§ 13 | |
70 | + | 21–104.2 through 21–104.4] § 21–104.2, § 21–104.3, § 21–104.4, OR § 21–104.6 of this 14 | |
71 | + | article; 15 | |
68 | 72 | ||
69 | - | ||
73 | + | 21–104.6. 16 | |
70 | 74 | ||
71 | - | (III) IF THE GOLF CART IS E QUIPPED WITH LIGHTIN G DEVICES | |
72 | - | AS REQUIRED BY THE ADMINISTRATION ; | |
75 | + | (A) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION , A PERSON WHO 17 | |
76 | + | OPERATES A GOLF CART ON A COUNTY HIGHWAY ON UPPER HOOPERS ISLAND, 18 | |
77 | + | MIDDLE HOOPERS ISLAND, OR TAYLORS ISLAND, WITHOUT REGISTRATION AS 19 | |
78 | + | AUTHORIZED UNDER § 13–402(C)(12) OF THIS ARTICLE: 20 | |
73 | 79 | ||
74 | - | (2) SHALL KEEP THE GOLF C ART AS FAR TO THE RI GHT OF THE | |
75 | - | ROADWAY AS FEASIBLE ; AND | |
80 | + | (1) MAY OPERATE THE GOLF CART ONLY : 21 | |
76 | 81 | ||
77 | - | (3) SHALL POSSESS A VALID DRIVER’S LICENSE. | |
82 | + | (I) ON A COUNTY HIGHWAY ON WHICH THE MAXIMUM POSTED 22 | |
83 | + | SPEED LIMIT DOES NOT EXCEED 30 MILES PER HOUR ; 23 | |
78 | 84 | ||
79 | - | (B) THE COUNTY COUNCIL OF DORCHESTER COUNTY MAY DESIGNATE BY | |
80 | - | RESOLUTION THE COUNTY HIGHWAYS ON UPPER HOOPERS ISLAND, MIDDLE | |
81 | - | HOOPERS ISLAND, OR TAYLORS ISLAND ON WHICH A PERSON MA Y OPERATE A GOLF | |
82 | - | CART. | |
85 | + | (II) BETWEEN DAWN AND DUSK ; AND 24 | |
83 | 86 | ||
84 | - | | |
85 | - | ||
87 | + | (III) IF THE GOLF CART IS E QUIPPED WITH LIGHTIN G DEVICES 25 | |
88 | + | AS REQUIRED BY THE ADMINISTRATION ; 26 | |
86 | 89 | ||
87 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2022. | |
90 | + | (2) SHALL KEEP THE GOLF C ART AS FAR TO THE RI GHT OF THE 27 | |
91 | + | ROADWAY AS FEASIBLE ; AND 28 | |
92 | + | ||
93 | + | (3) SHALL POSSESS A VALID DRIVER’S LICENSE. 29 | |
94 | + | ||
95 | + | (B) THE COUNTY COUNCIL OF DORCHESTER COUNTY MAY DESIGNATE BY 30 SENATE BILL 80 3 | |
96 | + | ||
97 | + | ||
98 | + | RESOLUTION THE COUNTY HIGHWAYS ON UPPER HOOPERS ISLAND, MIDDLE 1 | |
99 | + | HOOPERS ISLAND, OR TAYLORS ISLAND ON WHICH A PERSON MA Y OPERATE A GOLF 2 | |
100 | + | CART. 3 | |
101 | + | ||
102 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 4 | |
103 | + | October 1, 2022. 5 | |
104 | + | ||
105 | + | ||
106 | + | ||
107 | + | Approved: | |
108 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
109 | + | Governor. | |
110 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
111 | + | President of the Senate. | |
112 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
113 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. |