Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB836 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5- Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6- Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7-amendment.
85 *sb0836*
96
107 SENATE BILL 836
118 P2 2lr2611
129 SB 924/21 – EHE
1310 By: Senator Jennings
1411 Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022
1512 Assigned to: Budget and Taxation
16-Committee Report: Favorable with amendments
17-Senate action: Adopted
18-Read second time: March 18, 2022
1913
20-CHAPTER ______
14+A BILL ENTITLED
2115
2216 AN ACT concerning 1
2317
2418 Procurement – Information Technology – Cloud–Based Virtual Desktop 2
2519 Infrastructure 3
2620
2721 FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Information Technology to issue a request 4
28-for proposals for or make a certain determination on develop a plan for the 5
29-implementation of a certain model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based virtual 6
30-desktop infrastructure to be used by each unit of State government as desktop 7
31-support and management systems; and generally relating to the procurement of 8
32-cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure services. 9
22+for proposals for or make a certain determination on the implementation of a certain 5
23+model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure to be 6
24+used by each unit of State government as desktop support and management systems; 7
25+and generally relating to the procurement of cloud –based virtual desktop 8
26+infrastructure services. 9
3327
3428 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10
3529 That: 11
3630
3731 (a) In this section, “Device as a Service” means a service model that supports 12
3832 enterprise hardware, delivers end–to–end life cycle services for end users, allows the State 13
3933 to subscribe to end–user information technology devices including personal computers, 14
4034 smartphones, tablets, and other mobile devices, and standard operating software while 15
4135 outsourcing the device management, device backups, asset tracking, security, and 16
4236 end–of–life disposal to an external service provider. 17
4337
4438 (b) By July 1, 2023, the Department of Information Technology shall issue a 18
4539 request for proposals or make a determination to participate in an intergovernmental 19
46-cooperative purchasing agreement with another state develop a plan for the 20
47-implementation of a Device as a Service model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based 21 2 SENATE BILL 836
40+cooperative purchasing agreement with another state for the implementation of a Device 20
41+as a Service model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure 21
42+to be used by each unit of State government as desktop support and management systems. 22
4843
44+ (c) The Department: 23
4945
50-virtual desktop infrastructure to be used by each unit of State government as desktop 1
51-support and management systems. 2
52-
53- (c) The Department In developing the plan required under subsection (b) of this 3
54-section, the Department shall: 4
55-
56- (1) may evaluate options to contract for Device as a Service virtual desktop 5
57-infrastructure services consistent with Division II of the State Finance and Procurement 6
58-Article; and 7
59-
60- (2) shall: 8
61-
62- (i) review information technology contracts for fu ll–service 9
63-end–to–end enterprise device management and desktop support entered into by other 10
64-states; and 11
65-
66- (ii) (3) consider participating options to participate in an 12
67-intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement with another state for the 13
68-implementation and ongoing maintenance of Device as a Service cloud–based virtual 14
69-desktop infrastructure. 15
70-
71- (d) The factors used in evaluating a proposal or making a determination 16
72-developing the plan under this section shall include: 17
73-
74- (1) cost per device; 18
75-
76- (2) the quality of the Device as a Service model and cloud–based virtual 19
77-desktop infrastructure services; 20
78-
79- (3) the technical ability and experience of the offeror; and 21
80-
81- (4) the guaranteed savings to the State of using end–to–end life cycle 22
82-device management or cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure services compared to the 23
83-use of any preceding desktop support and management systems. 24
84-
85- (e) (1) On or before August 1, 2023, the Department shall submit a report of 25
86-the plan to the General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 26
87-Article. 27
88-
89- (2) On or before December 15, 2023, the Department shall submit a report 28
90-on the implementation of the plan to the General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 29
91-of the State Government Article, that includes estimated timelines for major 30
92-implementation milestones. 31
93-
94- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 32
95-October 1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of September 33 SENATE BILL 836 3
96-
97-
98-30, 2024, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 1
99-abrogated and of no further force and effect. 2
46+ (1) may contract for Device as a Service virtual desktop infrastructure 24
47+services consistent with Division II of the State Finance and Procurement Article; and 25 2 SENATE BILL 836
10048
10149
10250
51+ (2) shall: 1
10352
104-Approved:
105-________________________________________________________________________________
106- Governor.
107-________________________________________________________________________________
108- President of the Senate.
109-________________________________________________________________________________
110- Speaker of the House of Delegates.
53+ (i) review information technology contracts for full–service 2
54+end–to–end enterprise device management and desktop support entered into by other 3
55+states; and 4
56+
57+ (ii) consider participating in an intergovernmental cooperative 5
58+purchasing agreement with another state for the implementation and ongoing maintenance 6
59+of Device as a Service cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure. 7
60+
61+ (d) The factors used in evaluating a proposal or making a determination under 8
62+this section shall include: 9
63+
64+ (1) cost per device; 10
65+
66+ (2) the quality of the Device as a Service model and cloud–based virtual 11
67+desktop infrastructure services; 12
68+
69+ (3) the technical ability and experience of the offeror; and 13
70+
71+ (4) the guaranteed savings to the State of using end–to–end life cycle 14
72+device management or cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure services compared to the 15
73+use of any preceding desktop support and management systems. 16
74+
75+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 17
76+October 1, 2022. 18
77+