Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB836 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/30/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0836*  
  
SENATE BILL 836 
P2   	2lr2611 
SB 924/21 – EHE     
By: Senator Jennings 
Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 18, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Procurement – Information Technology – Cloud–Based Virtual Desktop 2 
Infrastructure 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Information Technology to issue a request 4 
for proposals for or make a certain determination on develop a plan for the 5 
implementation of a certain model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based virtual 6 
desktop infrastructure to be used by each unit of State government as desktop 7 
support and management systems; and generally relating to the procurement of 8 
cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure services. 9 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MA	RYLAND, 10 
That: 11 
 
 (a) In this section, “Device as a Service” means a service model that supports 12 
enterprise hardware, delivers end–to–end life cycle services for end users, allows the State 13 
to subscribe to end–user information technology devices including personal computers, 14 
smartphones, tablets, and other mobile devices, and standard operating software while 15 
outsourcing the device management, device backups, asset tracking, security, and  16 
end–of–life disposal to an external service provider. 17 
 
 (b) By July 1, 2023, the Department of Information Technology shall issue a 18 
request for proposals or make a determination to participate in an intergovernmental 19 
cooperative purchasing agreement with another state develop a plan for the 20 
implementation of a Device as a Service model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based 21  2 	SENATE BILL 836  
 
 
virtual desktop infrastructure to be used by each unit of State government as desktop 1 
support and management systems. 2 
 
 (c) The Department In developing the plan required under subsection (b) of this 3 
section, the Department shall: 4 
 
 (1) may evaluate options to contract for Device as a Service virtual desktop 5 
infrastructure services consistent with Division II of the State Finance and Procurement 6 
Article; and 7 
 
 (2) shall: 8 
 
 (i) review information technology contracts for fu ll–service  9 
end–to–end enterprise device management and desktop support entered into by other 10 
states; and  11 
 
 (ii) (3) consider participating options to participate in an 12 
intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement with another state for the 13 
implementation and ongoing maintenance of Device as a Service cloud–based virtual 14 
desktop infrastructure.  15 
 
 (d) The factors used in evaluating a proposal or making a determination 16 
developing the plan under this section shall include: 17 
 
 (1) cost per device; 18 
 
 (2) the quality of the Device as a Service model and cloud–based virtual 19 
desktop infrastructure services; 20 
 
 (3) the technical ability and experience of the offeror; and 21 
 
 (4) the guaranteed savings to the State of using end–to–end life cycle 22 
device management or cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure services compared to the 23 
use of any preceding desktop support and management systems. 24 
 
 (e) (1) On or before August 1, 2023, the Department shall submit a report of 25 
the plan to the General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 26 
Article. 27 
 
 (2) On or before December 15, 2023, the Department shall submit a report 28 
on the implementation of the plan to the General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 29 
of the State Government Article, that includes estimated timelines for major 30 
implementation milestones.  31 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 32 
October 1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of September 33   	SENATE BILL 836 	3 
 
 
30, 2024, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 1 
abrogated and of no further force and effect. 2 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.