House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {273529/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |