House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513722/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513722/1 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |