Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB858 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5- Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6- Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7-amendment.
85 *sb0858*
96
107 SENATE BILL 858
118 C7 2lr1416
12- CF HB 1316
13-By: Senator Guzzone Senators Guzzone and Jackson
9+
10+By: Senator Guzzone
1411 Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022
1512 Assigned to: Budget and Taxation
16-Committee Report: Favorable with amendments
17-Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments
18-Read second time: March 29, 2022
1913
20-CHAPTER ______
14+A BILL ENTITLED
2115
2216 AN ACT concerning 1
2317
2418 Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines 2
2519
2620 FOR the purpose of allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial 3
2721 bingo license on a certain date to operate up to a certain number of electronic instant 4
2822 bingo machines; and generally relating to electronic instant bingo machines. 5
2923
3024 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6
3125 Article – Criminal Law 7
3226 Section 12–308 8
3327 Annotated Code of Maryland 9
3428 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 10
3529
3630 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11
3731 Chapter 603 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2012 12
3832 Section 3 13
3933
4034 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14
4135 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15
4236
4337 Article – Criminal Law 16
4438
4539 12–308. 17
4640
4741 Notwithstanding any other provisions of this subtitle, an entity licensed to offer 18
48-instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, or by a qualified 19 2 SENATE BILL 858
42+instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, or by a qualified 19
43+organization as defined in § 13–201 of this article on the premises of the qualified 20
44+organization may continue to operate a game of instant bingo in the same manner using 21
45+electronic machines, provided that: 22
4946
50-
51-organization as defined in § 13–201 of this article on the premises of the qualified 1
52-organization may continue to operate a game of instant bingo in the same manner using 2
53-electronic machines, provided that: 3
54-
55- (1) (i) the machines were in operation for a 1–year period ending 4
56-December 31, 2007; or 5
57-
58- (ii) the machines were in operation under a commercial bingo license 6
59-on December 31, 2007; 7
60-
61- (2) (1) (I) [EXCEPT AS PROVIDED I N ITEM (II) OF THIS ITEM, the 8
62-entity] IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 OR MORE ELECTRONIC MACHINES ON 9
63-FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT does not operate more than the number of electronic machines in 10
64-operation on February 28, 2008; OR 11
65-
66- (II) 1. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED FEWER THAN 200 85 12
67-ELECTRONIC MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 13
68-199 100 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 14
69-
70- 2. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 87 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 15
71-ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 16
72-MACHINES; 17
73-
74- 3. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 100 ELECTRONIC 18
75-MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 19
76-ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 20
77-
78- 4. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 103 ELECTRONIC 21
79-MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 22
80-ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 23
81-
82- 5. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 ELECTRONIC 24
83-MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 225 250 25
84-ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; AND 26
85-
86- 6. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 278 ELECTRONIC 27
87-MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT O PERATE MORE THAN 300 295 28
88-ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; and 29
89-
90- (3) (2) the conduct of the gaming and operation of the machines are 30
91-consistent with all other provisions of this article. 31
92-
93-Chapter 603 of the Acts of 2012 32
94- SENATE BILL 858 3
95-
96-
97- SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, a licensee or organization 1
98-that is authorized under State law to own or operate electronic bingo machines for use after 2
99-July 1, 2012, may repair and replace the authorized electronic bingo machines provided 3
100-that the machines operate in the same manner as tho se in operation by the same 4
101-organization as of February 28, 2008[, and that the organization does not operate more 5
102-than the number of electronic bingo machines in operation as of February 28, 2008]. 6
103-
104- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act sha ll take effect July 7
105-1, 2022. 8
47+ (1) (i) the machines were in operation for a 1–year period ending 23
48+December 31, 2007; or 24 2 SENATE BILL 858
10649
10750
10851
52+ (ii) the machines were in operation under a commercial bingo license 1
53+on December 31, 2007; 2
10954
110-Approved:
111-________________________________________________________________________________
112- Governor.
113-________________________________________________________________________________
114- President of the Senate.
115-________________________________________________________________________________
116- Speaker of the House of Delegates.
55+ (2) (I) [the entity] IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 OR MORE 3
56+ELECTRONIC MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT does not operate more than the 4
57+number of electronic machines in operation on February 28, 2008; OR 5
58+
59+ (II) IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED FEWER THAN 200 ELECTRONIC 6
60+MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 199 7
61+ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; and 8
62+
63+ (3) the conduct of the gaming and operation of the machines are consistent 9
64+with all other provisions of this article. 10
65+
66+Chapter 603 of the Acts of 2012 11
67+
68+ SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, a licensee or organization 12
69+that is authorized under State law to own or operate electronic bingo machines for use after 13
70+July 1, 2012, may repair and replace the authorized electronic bingo machines provided 14
71+that the machines operate in the same manner as those in operation by the same 15
72+organization as of February 28, 2008[, and that the organization does not operate more 16
73+than the number of electronic bingo machines in operation as of February 28, 2008]. 17
74+
75+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 18
76+1, 2022. 19