Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB858 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/09/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDED TO EXIS TING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0858*  
  
SENATE BILL 858 
C7   	2lr1416 
    	CF HB 1316 
By: Senator Guzzone Senators Guzzone and Jackson 
Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments 
Read second time: March 29, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines 2 
 
FOR the purpose of allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial 3 
bingo license on a certain date to operate up to a certain number of electronic instant 4 
bingo machines; and generally relating to electronic instant bingo machines.  5 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 
 Article – Criminal Law 7 
Section 12–308 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11 
 Chapter 603 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2012 12 
Section 3 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Criminal Law 16 
 
12–308. 17 
 
 Notwithstanding any other provisions of this subtitle, an entity licensed to offer 18 
instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, or by a qualified 19  2 	SENATE BILL 858  
 
 
organization as defined in § 13–201 of this article on the premises of the qualified 1 
organization may continue to operate a game of instant bingo in the same manner using 2 
electronic machines, provided that: 3 
 
 (1) (i) the machines were in operation for a 1–year period ending 4 
December 31, 2007; or 5 
 
 (ii) the machines were in operation under a commercial bingo license 6 
on December 31, 2007; 7 
 
 (2) (1)  (I) [EXCEPT AS PROVIDED I N ITEM (II) OF THIS ITEM, the 8 
entity] IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 OR MORE ELECTRONIC MACHINES ON 9 
FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT does not operate more than the number of electronic machines in 10 
operation on February 28, 2008; OR 11 
 
 (II) 1. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED FEWER THAN 200 85 12 
ELECTRONIC MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 13 
199 100 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ;  14 
 
 2. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 87 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 15 
ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 16 
MACHINES; 17 
 
 3. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 100 ELECTRONIC 18 
MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 19 
ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 20 
 
 4. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 103 ELECTRONIC 21 
MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 22 
ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 23 
 
 5. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 ELECTRONIC 24 
MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 225 250 25 
ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; AND 26 
 
 6. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 278 ELECTRONIC 27 
MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT O PERATE MORE THAN 300 295 28 
ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; and 29 
 
 (3) (2) the conduct of the gaming and operation of the machines are 30 
consistent with all other provisions of this article. 31 
 
Chapter 603 of the Acts of 2012 32 
   	SENATE BILL 858 	3 
 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, a licensee or organization 1 
that is authorized under State law to own or operate electronic bingo machines for use after 2 
July 1, 2012, may repair and replace the authorized electronic bingo machines provided 3 
that the machines operate in the same manner as tho se in operation by the same 4 
organization as of February 28, 2008[, and that the organization does not operate more 5 
than the number of electronic bingo machines in operation as of February 28, 2008]. 6 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act sha ll take effect July 7 
1, 2022.  8 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.