Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-2) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {893722/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {403929/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Finance |