Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 09/30/2021 | Pre-filed |