Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 352 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 352 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 90) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0090* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Department of the Environment – Supplemental Environmental Projects | |
10 | - | Database | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 90 | |
11 | + | M3 2lr0612 | |
12 | + | SB 446/21 – EHE (PRE–FILED) CF HB 595 | |
13 | + | By: Senator West | |
14 | + | Requested: September 30, 2021 | |
15 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 | |
16 | + | Assigned to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: February 13, 2022 | |
11 | 20 | ||
12 | - | FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of the Environment to create and maintain | |
13 | - | a database of supplemental environmental projects that the Department may | |
14 | - | consider for implementation as part of a settlement of an enforcement action; | |
15 | - | requiring the Department to prioritize the selection of a supplementa l | |
16 | - | environmental project located in the same geographic area as the alleged violation | |
17 | - | and to ensure that the scope and cost of a chosen project meet certain criteria; and | |
18 | - | generally relating to a supplemental environmental projects database. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
19 | 22 | ||
20 | - | BY adding to | |
21 | - | Article – Environment | |
22 | - | Section 1–306 | |
23 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
24 | - | (2013 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
25 | 24 | ||
26 | - | ||
27 | - | ||
25 | + | Department of the Environment – Supplemental Environmental Projects 2 | |
26 | + | Database 3 | |
28 | 27 | ||
29 | - | Article – Environment | |
28 | + | FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of the Environment to create and maintain 4 | |
29 | + | a database of supplemental environmental projects that the Department may 5 | |
30 | + | consider for implementation as part of a settlement of an enforcement action; 6 | |
31 | + | requiring the Department to prioritize the selection of a supplemental 7 | |
32 | + | environmental project located in the same geographic area as the alleged violation 8 | |
33 | + | and to ensure that the scope and cost of a chosen project meet certain criteria; and 9 | |
34 | + | generally relating to a supplemental environmental projects database. 10 | |
30 | 35 | ||
31 | - | 1–306. | |
36 | + | BY adding to 11 | |
37 | + | Article – Environment 12 | |
38 | + | Section 1–306 13 | |
39 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 14 | |
40 | + | (2013 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 15 | |
32 | 41 | ||
33 | - | (A) IN THIS SECTION, “SUPPLEMENTAL ENVIRON MENTAL PROJECT ” MEANS | |
34 | - | AN ENVIRONMENTALLY B ENEFICIAL PROJECT OR ACTIVITY THAT IS NOT REQUIRED | |
35 | - | BY LAW BUT THAT AN A LLEGED VIOLATOR AGRE ES TO UNDERTAKE AS P ART OF A | |
36 | - | SETTLEMENT OR ENFORC EMENT ACTION . | |
42 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 16 | |
43 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 17 | |
37 | 44 | ||
38 | - | (B) (1) SUBJECT TO P ARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE | |
39 | - | DEPARTMENT SHALL CREA TE AND MAINTAIN A DA TABASE OF SUPPLEMENT AL | |
40 | - | ENVIRONMENTAL PROJEC TS THAT THE DEPARTMENT MAY CONSID ER FOR | |
41 | - | IMPLEMENTATION AS PA RT OF A SETTLEMENT O F AN ENFORCEMENT ACT ION. | |
45 | + | Article – Environment 18 | |
42 | 46 | ||
43 | - | (2) IN CREATING AND MAINT AINING THE DATABASE , THE | |
44 | - | DEPARTMENT SHALL SOLI CIT INPUT FROM COMMU NITIES IN THE STATE THAT ARE | |
45 | - | OVERBURDENED , UNDERSERVED , OR OTHERWISE DISADVA NTAGED BY | |
46 | - | ENVIRONMENTAL STRESS ORS. | |
47 | - | Ch. 352 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
47 | + | 1–306. 19 | |
48 | + | 2 SENATE BILL 90 | |
48 | 49 | ||
49 | - | – 2 – | |
50 | - | (C) (1) THE DEPARTMENT MAY , WITH REASONABLE JUST IFICATION, | |
51 | - | CONSIDER A SUPPLEMEN TAL ENVIRONMENTAL PR OJECT THAT IS NOT IN CLUDED IN | |
52 | - | THE DATABASE REQUIRE D IN SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION AS P ART OF A | |
53 | - | SETTLEMENT OF AN ENF ORCEMENT ACTION . | |
54 | 50 | ||
55 | - | (2) THE DEPARTMENT MAY NOT CH OOSE A SUPPLEMENTAL | |
56 | - | ENVIRONMENTAL PROJEC T OFFERED BY THE VIO LATOR UNLESS THE DEPARTMENT : | |
51 | + | (A) IN THIS SECTION, “SUPPLEMENTAL ENVIRON MENTAL PROJECT ” MEANS 1 | |
52 | + | AN ENVIRONMENTALLY B ENEFICIAL PROJECT OR ACTIVITY THAT IS NOT REQUIRED 2 | |
53 | + | BY LAW BUT THAT AN ALLEGED VIOLATOR AGR EES TO UNDERTAKE AS PART OF A 3 | |
54 | + | SETTLEMENT OR ENFORC EMENT ACTION . 4 | |
57 | 55 | ||
58 | - | (I) APPROVES THE PROJECT; AND | |
56 | + | (B) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE 5 | |
57 | + | DEPARTMENT SHALL CREA TE AND MAINTAIN A DA TABASE OF SUPPLEMENT AL 6 | |
58 | + | ENVIRONMENTAL PROJEC TS THAT THE DEPARTMENT MAY CO NSIDER FOR 7 | |
59 | + | IMPLEMENTATION AS PA RT OF A SETTLEMENT O F AN ENFORCEMENT ACT ION. 8 | |
59 | 60 | ||
60 | - | (II) MAINTAINS DOCUMENTATI ON OF THE APPROVAL . | |
61 | + | (2) IN CREATING AND MAINT AINING THE DATABASE , THE 9 | |
62 | + | DEPARTMENT SHALL SOLI CIT INPUT FROM COMMU NITIES IN THE STATE THAT ARE 10 | |
63 | + | OVERBURDENED , UNDERSERVED , OR OTHERWISE DISADVA NTAGED BY 11 | |
64 | + | ENVIRONMENTAL STRESS ORS. 12 | |
61 | 65 | ||
62 | - | (D) BEFORE A VIOLATOR UND ERTAKES A SUPPLEMENT AL ENVIRONMENTAL | |
63 | - | PROJECT, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : | |
66 | + | (C) (1) THE DEPARTMENT MAY , WITH REASONABLE JUST IFICATION, 13 | |
67 | + | CONSIDER A SUPPLEMEN TAL ENVIRONMENTAL PR OJECT THAT IS NOT IN CLUDED IN 14 | |
68 | + | THE DATABASE REQUIRE D IN SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION AS P ART OF A 15 | |
69 | + | SETTLEMENT OF AN ENF ORCEMENT AC TION. 16 | |
64 | 70 | ||
65 | - | (1) GIVE PRIORITY CONSIDE RATION TO THE SELECTION OF A | |
66 | - | PROJECT LOCATED IN T HE SAME GEOGRAPHIC A REA IMPACTED BY THE ALLEGED | |
67 | - | VIOLATION; AND | |
71 | + | (2) THE DEPARTMENT MAY NOT CH OOSE A SUPPLEMENTAL 17 | |
72 | + | ENVIRONMENTAL PROJEC T OFFERED BY THE VIO LATOR UNLESS THE DEPARTMENT : 18 | |
68 | 73 | ||
69 | - | (2) ENSURE THAT THE SCOPE AND C OST OF THE CHOSEN PR OJECT IS | |
70 | - | REASONABLY RELATED T O THE NEXUS OF THE VIOLATION OR THE ADVERSE IMPAC T | |
71 | - | OF THE VIOLATION AND THAT THE COST IS SUFFICIE NT TO ALLOW THE | |
72 | - | DEPARTMENT AND THE AL LEGED VIOLATOR TO RE ACH A SETTLEMENT . | |
74 | + | (I) APPROVES THE PROJECT; AND 19 | |
73 | 75 | ||
74 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
75 | - | October 1, 2022. | |
76 | + | (II) MAINTAINS DOCUMENTATI ON OF THE APPROVAL . 20 | |
76 | 77 | ||
77 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2022. | |
78 | + | (D) BEFORE A VIOLATOR UND ERTAKES A SUPPLEMENTAL ENVIRON MENTAL 21 | |
79 | + | PROJECT, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 22 | |
80 | + | ||
81 | + | (1) GIVE PRIORITY CONSIDE RATION TO THE SELECTION OF A 23 | |
82 | + | PROJECT LOCATED IN T HE SAME GEOGRAPHIC A REA IMPACTED BY THE ALLEGED 24 | |
83 | + | VIOLATION; AND 25 | |
84 | + | ||
85 | + | (2) ENSURE THAT THE SCOPE AND C OST OF THE CHOSEN PR OJECT IS 26 | |
86 | + | REASONABLY RELATED T O THE NEXUS OF THE VIOLATION OR THE ADVERSE IMPAC T 27 | |
87 | + | OF THE VIOLATION AND THAT THE COST IS SUFFICIE NT TO ALLOW THE 28 | |
88 | + | DEPARTMENT AND THE AL LEGED VIOLATOR TO RE ACH A SETTLEMENT . 29 | |
89 | + | ||
90 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 30 | |
91 | + | October 1, 2022. 31 | |
92 | + |