Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 278 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 278 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 906) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0906* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Carroll County – State’s Attorney – Restrictions on Practice | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 906 | |
11 | + | D2, E2 2lr2940 | |
12 | + | CF HB 692 | |
13 | + | By: Carroll County Senators | |
14 | + | Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2022 | |
15 | + | Assigned to: Rules | |
16 | + | Re–referred to: Judicial Proceedings, February 25, 2022 | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: March 16, 2022 | |
10 | 20 | ||
11 | - | FOR the purpose of prohibiting the State’s Attorney in Carroll County from engaging in | |
12 | - | the private practice of law; and generally relating to State’s Attorneys and Carroll | |
13 | - | County. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
14 | 22 | ||
15 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
16 | - | Article – Criminal Procedure | |
17 | - | Section 15–407 | |
18 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
19 | - | (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
20 | 24 | ||
21 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
22 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
25 | + | Carroll County – State’s Attorney – Restrictions on Practice 2 | |
23 | 26 | ||
24 | - | Article – Criminal Procedure | |
27 | + | FOR the purpose of prohibiting the State’s Attorney in Carroll County from engaging in 3 | |
28 | + | the private practice of law; and generally relating to State’s Attorneys and Carroll 4 | |
29 | + | County. 5 | |
25 | 30 | ||
26 | - | 15–407. | |
31 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 | |
32 | + | Article – Criminal Procedure 7 | |
33 | + | Section 15–407 8 | |
34 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 9 | |
35 | + | (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 10 | |
27 | 36 | ||
28 | - | (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. | |
37 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 | |
38 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 | |
29 | 39 | ||
30 | - | (b) (1) (i) The State’s Attorney’s salary is the following percentages of the | |
31 | - | salary of a judge of the District Court of Maryland: | |
40 | + | Article – Criminal Procedure 13 | |
32 | 41 | ||
33 | - | ||
42 | + | 15–407. 14 | |
34 | 43 | ||
35 | - | | |
44 | + | (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 15 | |
36 | 45 | ||
37 | - | 3. 100%, beginning on December 3, 2019, and thereafter. | |
46 | + | (b) (1) (i) The State’s Attorney’s salary is the following percentages of the 16 | |
47 | + | salary of a judge of the District Court of Maryland: 17 | |
48 | + | 2 SENATE BILL 906 | |
38 | 49 | ||
39 | - | (ii) A salary increase shall take effect at the beginning of the elected | |
40 | - | term of office and may not increase during the term of office. | |
41 | 50 | ||
42 | - | | |
51 | + | 1. 80%, ending on December 3, 2018; 1 | |
43 | 52 | ||
44 | - | (i) provide space for the offices of the State’s Attorney and pay the | |
45 | - | expenses of the office, including general operating expenses, equipment costs, and | |
46 | - | reasonable costs for secretarial or stenographic needs; or | |
53 | + | 2. 90%, beginning on December 4, 2018; and 2 | |
47 | 54 | ||
48 | - | (ii) as determined by the county commissioners, pay a reasonable | |
49 | - | allowance to reimburse the State’s Attorney for the costs of the operation of the office. Ch. 278 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
55 | + | 3. 100%, beginning on December 3, 2019, and thereafter. 3 | |
50 | 56 | ||
51 | - | – 2 – | |
57 | + | (ii) A salary increase shall take effect at the beginning of the elected 4 | |
58 | + | term of office and may not increase during the term of office. 5 | |
52 | 59 | ||
53 | - | ( | |
60 | + | (2) The county commissioners shall: 6 | |
54 | 61 | ||
55 | - | (i) may appoint two deputy State’s Attorneys and the number of | |
56 | - | assistant State’s Attorneys necessary to staff the office; and | |
62 | + | (i) provide space for the offices of the State’s Attorney and pay the 7 | |
63 | + | expenses of the office, including general operating expenses, equipment costs, and 8 | |
64 | + | reasonable costs for secretarial or stenographic needs; or 9 | |
57 | 65 | ||
58 | - | (ii) | |
59 | - | ||
66 | + | (ii) as determined by the county commissioners, pay a reasonable 10 | |
67 | + | allowance to reimburse the State’s Attorney for the costs of the operation of the office. 11 | |
60 | 68 | ||
61 | - | (2) (i) In addition to the assistant State’s Attorneys appointed under | |
62 | - | paragraph (1) of this subsection, if both the State’s Attorney and the resident judge of the | |
63 | - | circuit court of the county consider it necessary and the judge approves, the State’s Attorney | |
64 | - | may appoint an assistant State’s Attorney. | |
69 | + | (c) (1) The State’s Attorney: 12 | |
65 | 70 | ||
66 | - | ( | |
67 | - | State’s | |
71 | + | (i) may appoint two deputy State’s Attorneys and the number of 13 | |
72 | + | assistant State’s Attorneys necessary to staff the office; and 14 | |
68 | 73 | ||
69 | - | ( | |
70 | - | ||
74 | + | (ii) subject to the approval of the county commissioners, shall set the 15 | |
75 | + | salaries for the deputy and assistant State’s Attorneys. 16 | |
71 | 76 | ||
72 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
73 | - | October 1, 2022. | |
77 | + | (2) (i) In addition to the assistant State’s Attorneys appointed under 17 | |
78 | + | paragraph (1) of this subsection, if both the State’s Attorney and the resident judge of the 18 | |
79 | + | circuit court of the county consider it necessary and the judge approves, the State’s Attorney 19 | |
80 | + | may appoint an assistant State’s Attorney. 20 | |
74 | 81 | ||
75 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 12, 2022. | |
82 | + | (ii) The county commissioners shall set the salary of an assistant 21 | |
83 | + | State’s Attorney appointed under this paragraph. 22 | |
84 | + | ||
85 | + | (d) The State’s Attorney shall serve full time AND MAY NOT ENGAGE I N THE 23 | |
86 | + | PRIVATE PRACTICE OF LAW. 24 | |
87 | + | ||
88 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 25 | |
89 | + | October 1, 2022. 26 | |
90 | + |