Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB906 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/19/2022

                             LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 278 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 278 
(Senate Bill 906) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Carroll County – State’s Attorney – Restrictions on Practice 
 
FOR the purpose of prohibiting the State’s Attorney in Carroll County from engaging in 
the private practice of law; and generally relating to State’s Attorneys and Carroll 
County. 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – Criminal Procedure 
Section 15–407 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Criminal Procedure 
 
15–407. 
 
 (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 
 
 (b) (1) (i) The State’s Attorney’s salary is the following percentages of the 
salary of a judge of the District Court of Maryland: 
 
 1. 80%, ending on December 3, 2018; 
 
 2. 90%, beginning on December 4, 2018; and 
 
 3. 100%, beginning on December 3, 2019, and thereafter. 
 
 (ii) A salary increase shall take effect at the beginning of the elected 
term of office and may not increase during the term of office. 
 
 (2) The county commissioners shall: 
 
 (i) provide space for the offices of the State’s Attorney and pay the 
expenses of the office, including general operating expenses, equipment costs, and 
reasonable costs for secretarial or stenographic needs; or 
 
 (ii) as determined by the county commissioners, pay a reasonable 
allowance to reimburse the State’s Attorney for the costs of the operation of the office.  Ch. 278 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 
 (c) (1) The State’s Attorney: 
 
 (i) may appoint two deputy State’s Attorneys and the number of 
assistant State’s Attorneys necessary to staff the office; and 
 
 (ii) subject to the approval of the county commissioners, shall set the 
salaries for the deputy and assistant State’s Attorneys. 
 
 (2) (i) In addition to the assistant State’s Attorneys appointed under 
paragraph (1) of this subsection, if both the State’s Attorney and the resident judge of the 
circuit court of the county consider it necessary and the judge approves, the State’s Attorney 
may appoint an assistant State’s Attorney. 
 
 (ii) The county commissioners shall set the salary of an assistant 
State’s Attorney appointed under this paragraph. 
 
 (d) The State’s Attorney shall serve full time AND MAY NOT ENGAGE I N THE 
PRIVATE PRACTICE OF LAW. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
October 1, 2022. 
 
Approved by the Governor, May 12, 2022.