Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (124-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {923924/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |