House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |