Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (126-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |