12 | | - | FOR the purpose of altering the entity with which the Maryland Stadium Authority must |
---|
13 | | - | enter into a written operating agreement before issuing bonds to finance the |
---|
14 | | - | Hagerstown Multi –Use Sports and Events Facility from the |
---|
15 | | - | Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial Foundation to The Hagerstown |
---|
16 | | - | Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.; and generally relating to the |
---|
17 | | - | Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility. |
---|
| 13 | + | By: Senator Corderman |
---|
| 14 | + | Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 |
---|
| 15 | + | Assigned to: Rules |
---|
| 16 | + | Re–referred to: Finance, February 21, 2022 |
---|
| 17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable |
---|
| 18 | + | Senate action: Adopted |
---|
| 19 | + | Read second time: March 7, 2022 |
---|
38 | | - | (a) Except as authorized by § 10–639 of this subtitle, to finance site acquisition, |
---|
39 | | - | design, and construction of any segment of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events |
---|
40 | | - | Facility, the Authority shall comply with this section. |
---|
| 41 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 15 |
---|
| 42 | + | Article – Economic Development 16 |
---|
| 43 | + | Section 10–646.2(e), (f), and (g) 17 |
---|
| 44 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 18 |
---|
| 45 | + | (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 19 |
---|
62 | | - | (ii) to maintain and repair or contract for the maintenance and |
---|
63 | | - | repair of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility so as to keep the |
---|
64 | | - | Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in first–class operating condition; |
---|
| 56 | + | (a) Except as authorized by § 10–639 of this subtitle, to finance site acquisition, 3 |
---|
| 57 | + | design, and construction of any segment of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events 4 |
---|
| 58 | + | Facility, the Authority shall comply with this section. 5 |
---|
68 | | - | (i) protecting the investments of the Authority and [the |
---|
69 | | - | Hagerstown–Washington County Ind ustrial Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN |
---|
70 | | - | MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., in the Hagerstown Multi–Use |
---|
71 | | - | Sports and Events Facility; |
---|
| 65 | + | (f) The Authority shall secure a written agreement to transfer ownership of the 10 |
---|
| 66 | + | Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility from the Authority to [the 11 |
---|
| 67 | + | Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial Foundation ] THE HAGERSTOWN 12 |
---|
| 68 | + | MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., as approved by the Board of Public 13 |
---|
| 69 | + | Works: 14 |
---|
73 | | - | (ii) requiring [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial |
---|
74 | | - | Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., |
---|
75 | | - | to contribute to a capital improvement reserve fund an amount sufficient to keep the |
---|
76 | | - | Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in first–class operating condition; |
---|
| 71 | + | (1) in which [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial Foundation] 15 |
---|
| 72 | + | THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., agrees to: 16 |
---|
78 | | - | (iii) requiring [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial |
---|
79 | | - | Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., |
---|
80 | | - | to be solely responsible for all expenditures relating to the operation of the Hagerstown |
---|
81 | | - | Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility that may be incurred, including operating deficits; |
---|
82 | | - | and |
---|
| 74 | + | (i) own, market, promote, and operate or contract for the marketing, 17 |
---|
| 75 | + | promotion, and operation of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in a 18 |
---|
| 76 | + | manner that maximizes the Facility’s economic return; and 19 |
---|
84 | | - | (iv) allowing [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial |
---|
85 | | - | Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., |
---|
86 | | - | to keep all operating profits resulting from the operation of the Hagerstown Multi–Use |
---|
87 | | - | Sports and Events Facility each year; and |
---|
| 78 | + | (ii) to maintain and repair or contract for the maintenance and 20 |
---|
| 79 | + | repair of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility so as to keep the 21 |
---|
| 80 | + | Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in first–class operating condition; 22 |
---|
93 | | - | (g) On or before December 31 each year, [the Hagerstown–Washington County |
---|
94 | | - | Industrial Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS |
---|
95 | | - | FACILITY, INC., shall report to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 252 |
---|
| 84 | + | (i) protecting the investments of the Authority and [the 24 |
---|
| 85 | + | Hagerstown–Washington County Indu strial Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN 25 |
---|
| 86 | + | MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., in the Hagerstown Multi–Use 26 |
---|
| 87 | + | Sports and Events Facility; 27 |
---|
97 | | - | – 3 – |
---|
98 | | - | Appropriations Committee, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, |
---|
99 | | - | on the Facility’s assessment of the maintenance and repair needed to keep the Hagerstown |
---|
100 | | - | Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in operating order. |
---|
| 89 | + | (ii) requiring [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial 28 |
---|
| 90 | + | Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., 29 |
---|
| 91 | + | to contribute to a capital improvement reserve fund an amount sufficient to keep the 30 |
---|
| 92 | + | Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in first–class operating condition; 31 |
---|
105 | | - | Approved by the Governor, May 12, 2022. |
---|
| 98 | + | |
---|
| 99 | + | Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility that may be incurred, including operating deficits; 1 |
---|
| 100 | + | and 2 |
---|
| 101 | + | |
---|
| 102 | + | (iv) allowing [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial 3 |
---|
| 103 | + | Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., 4 |
---|
| 104 | + | to keep all operating profits resulting from the operation of the Hagerstown Multi–Use 5 |
---|
| 105 | + | Sports and Events Facility each year; and 6 |
---|
| 106 | + | |
---|
| 107 | + | (3) to be solely responsible for all expenditures relating to the operation, 7 |
---|
| 108 | + | maintenance, and repair of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility that may 8 |
---|
| 109 | + | be incurred, including the amount by which expenditures exceed revenues. 9 |
---|
| 110 | + | |
---|
| 111 | + | (g) On or before December 31 each year, [the Hagerstown–Washington County 10 |
---|
| 112 | + | Industrial Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS 11 |
---|
| 113 | + | FACILITY, INC., shall report to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House 12 |
---|
| 114 | + | Appropriations Committee, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, 13 |
---|
| 115 | + | on the Facility’s assessment of the maintenance and repair needed to keep the Hagerstown 14 |
---|
| 116 | + | Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in operating order. 15 |
---|
| 117 | + | |
---|
| 118 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 16 |
---|
| 119 | + | October 1, 2022. 17 |
---|
| 120 | + | |
---|
| 121 | + | |
---|
| 122 | + | |
---|
| 123 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 124 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ |
---|
| 125 | + | Governor. |
---|
| 126 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ |
---|
| 127 | + | President of the Senate. |
---|
| 128 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ |
---|
| 129 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. |
---|