Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (93-32) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (29-17) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713526/1 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |