Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |