Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB932 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 281
21
3-– 1 –
4-Chapter 281
5-(Senate Bill 932)
62
7-AN ACT concerning
3+EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LA W.
4+ [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5+ Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6+ Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7+amendment.
8+ *sb0932*
89
9-Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of
10-Bowie
10+SENATE BILL 932
11+E4 2lr3120
12+ CF HB 1439
13+By: Senator Watson
14+Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022
15+Assigned to: Rules
16+Re–referred to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs, February 21, 2022
17+Committee Report: Favorable
18+Senate action: Adopted
19+Read second time: March 5, 2022
1120
12-FOR the purpose of authorizing the City of Bowie to participate in the Maryland Intrastate
13-Emergency Management Assistance Compact; and generally relating to the
14-Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact.
21+CHAPTER ______
1522
16-BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments,
17- Article – Public Safety
18-Section 14–801(a) and 14–803(1) and (2)
19- Annotated Code of Maryland
20- (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement)
23+AN ACT concerning 1
2124
22-BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments,
23- Article – Public Safety
24- Section 14–801(e)
25- Annotated Code of Maryland
26- (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement)
25+Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of 2
26+Bowie 3
2727
28- SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND,
29-That the Laws of Maryland read as follows:
28+FOR the purpose of authorizing the City of Bowie to participate in the Maryland Intrastate 4
29+Emergency Management Assistance Compact; and generally relating to the 5
30+Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact. 6
3031
31-Article – Public Safety
32+BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 7
33+ Article – Public Safety 8
34+Section 14–801(a) and 14–803(1) and (2) 9
35+ Annotated Code of Maryland 10
36+ (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11
3237
33-14–801.
38+BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12
39+ Article – Public Safety 13
40+ Section 14–801(e) 14
41+ Annotated Code of Maryland 15
42+ (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16
3443
35- (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated.
44+ SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17
45+That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18
3646
37- (e) “Jurisdictions” means the 23 counties within Maryland, Baltimore City, the
38-City of Annapolis, THE CITY OF BOWIE, the City of Laurel, and Ocean City.
47+Article – Public Safety 19
48+ 2 SENATE BILL 932
3949
40-14–803.
4150
42- (1) Article 1. Purpose.
51+14–801. 1
4352
44- (a) (1) The purpose of this Compact is to provide for emergency
45-management mutual assistance between the jurisdictions entering into this Compact.
53+ (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 2
4654
47- (2) This Compact also shall provide for mutual cooperation in
48-emergency management–related exercises, testing, or other training activities.
49- Ch. 281 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND
55+ (e) “Jurisdictions” means the 23 counties within Maryland, Baltimore City, the 3
56+City of Annapolis, THE CITY OF BOWIE, the City of Laurel, and Ocean City. 4
5057
51-– 2 –
52- (2) Article 2. Requests for Assistance.
58+14–803. 5
5359
54- (b) (1) The senior elected official of each jurisdiction shall designate
55-authorized representatives. An authorized representative of a party jurisdiction may
56-request assistance from another party jurisdiction by contacting an authorized
57-representative of that jurisdiction.
60+ (1) Article 1. Purpose. 6
5861
59- (2) The provisions of this Compact shall apply only to requests for
60-assistance made by and to authorized representatives.
62+ (a) (1) The purpose of this Compact is to provide for emergency 7
63+management mutual assistance between the jurisdictions entering into this Compact. 8
6164
62- (3) Requests may be verbal or in writing.
65+ (2) This Compact also shall provide for mutual cooperation in 9
66+emergency management–related exercises, testing, or other training activities. 10
6367
64- (4) If verbal, the request shall be confirmed in writing at the earliest
65-possible date, but no later than 10 calendar days following the verbal request.
68+ (2) Article 2. Requests for Assistance. 11
6669
67- (5) Written requests shall provide the following information:
70+ (b) (1) The senior elected official of each jurisdiction shall designate 12
71+authorized representatives. An authorized representative of a party jurisdiction may 13
72+request assistance from another party jurisdiction by contacting an authorized 14
73+representative of that jurisdiction. 15
6874
69- (i) The functional areas for which assistance is needed,
70-including fire services, law enforcement, emergency medical services, transportation,
71-communications, public works and engineering, building inspection, planning and
72-information assistance, mass care, resource support, health and medical services, and
73-search and rescue;
75+ (2) The provisions of this Compact shall apply only to requests for 16
76+assistance made by and to authorized representatives. 17
7477
75- (ii) The mission, capability, size, and amount of the requested
76-aid; and
78+ (3) Requests may be verbal or in writing. 18
7779
78- (iii) The logistics, location, and time for staging the aid from a
79-responding party jurisdiction.
80+ (4) If verbal, the request shall be confirmed in writing at the earliest 19
81+possible date, but no later than 10 calendar days following the verbal request. 20
8082
81- (6) There shall be frequent consultations between the Maryland
82-Department of Emergency Management and appropriate representatives of the party
83-jurisdictions with the unhindered exchange of information and plans generally relating to
84-emergency management.
83+ (5) Written requests shall provide the following information: 21
8584
86- (7) An authorized representative of the requesting party jurisdiction
87-will advise the Maryland Department of Emergency Management of verbal requests and
88-provide copies of written requests.
85+ (i) The functional areas for which assistance is needed, 22
86+including fire services, law enforcement, emergency medical services, transportation, 23
87+communications, public works and engineering, building inspection, planning and 24
88+information assistance, mass care, resource support, health and medical services, and 25
89+search and rescue; 26
8990
90- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect
91-October 1, 2022.
91+ (ii) The mission, capability, size, and amount of the requested 27
92+aid; and 28
9293
93-Approved by the Governor, May 12, 2022.
94+ (iii) The logistics, location, and time for staging the aid from a 29
95+responding party jurisdiction. 30
96+ SENATE BILL 932 3
97+
98+
99+ (6) There shall be frequent consultations between the Maryland 1
100+Department of Emergency Management and appropriate representatives of the party 2
101+jurisdictions with the unhindered exchange of information and plans generally relating to 3
102+emergency management. 4
103+
104+ (7) An authorized representative of the requesting party jurisdiction 5
105+will advise the Maryland Department of Emergency Management of verbal requests and 6
106+provide copies of written requests. 7
107+
108+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take ef fect 8
109+October 1, 2022. 9
110+
111+
112+
113+Approved:
114+________________________________________________________________________________
115+ Governor.
116+________________________________________________________________________________
117+ President of the Senate.
118+________________________________________________________________________________
119+ Speaker of the House of Delegates.