Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {473924/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2021 | Pre-filed |