Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/19/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |