Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 386 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 386 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 988) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0988* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Dorchester County – Orphans’ Court – Salary and Expense Allowance of | |
10 | - | Orphans’ Court Judges | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 988 | |
11 | + | N2 2lr3266 | |
12 | + | CF HB 1456 | |
13 | + | By: Senator Eckardt (By Request – Dorchester County Council) | |
14 | + | Introduced and read first time: February 19, 2022 | |
15 | + | Assigned to: Rules | |
16 | + | Re–referred to: Judicial Proceedings, February 25, 2022 | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: March 16, 2022 | |
11 | 20 | ||
12 | - | FOR the purpose of increasing the salary and annual expense allowance of a judge of the | |
13 | - | Orphans’ Court for Dorchester County; and generally relating to the Orphans’ Court | |
14 | - | for Dorchester County. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
15 | 22 | ||
16 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
17 | - | Article – Estates and Trusts | |
18 | - | Section 2–108(k) | |
19 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
20 | - | (2017 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
21 | 24 | ||
22 | - | ||
23 | - | ||
25 | + | Dorchester County – Orphans’ Court – Salary and Expense Allowance of 2 | |
26 | + | Orphans’ Court Judges 3 | |
24 | 27 | ||
25 | - | Article – Estates and Trusts | |
28 | + | FOR the purpose of increasing the salary and annual expense allowance of a judge of the 4 | |
29 | + | Orphans’ Court for Dorchester County; and generally relating to the Orphans’ Court 5 | |
30 | + | for Dorchester County. 6 | |
26 | 31 | ||
27 | - | 2–108. | |
32 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 | |
33 | + | Article – Estates and Trusts 8 | |
34 | + | Section 2–108(k) 9 | |
35 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 10 | |
36 | + | (2017 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 | |
28 | 37 | ||
29 | - | | |
30 | - | ||
38 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 | |
39 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 | |
31 | 40 | ||
32 | - | (2) Each judge shall also receive an expense allowance as determined by | |
33 | - | the County Council, but not less than [$800] $1,000 annually. | |
41 | + | Article – Estates and Trusts 14 | |
34 | 42 | ||
35 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, pursuant to Article III, § 35 | |
36 | - | of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to the salary | |
37 | - | or compensation of a judge of the Orphans’ Court for Dorchester County while serving in a | |
38 | - | term of office beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act | |
39 | - | concerning the salary or compensation of a judge of the Orphans’ Court for Dorchester | |
40 | - | County shall take effect at the beginning of the next following term of office. This limitation | |
41 | - | does not apply to an individual appointed or elected after the effective date of this Act to | |
42 | - | fill out an unexpired term. | |
43 | + | 2–108. 15 | |
43 | 44 | ||
44 | - | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
45 | - | October 1, 2022. | |
45 | + | (k) (1) Each of the judges of the Court for Dorchester County shall receive an 16 | |
46 | + | annual salary as determined by the County Council, but not less than [$4,700] $6,000. 17 | |
47 | + | 2 SENATE BILL 988 | |
46 | 48 | ||
47 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2022. | |
49 | + | ||
50 | + | (2) Each judge shall also receive an expense allowance as determined by 1 | |
51 | + | the County Council, but not less than [$800] $1,000 annually. 2 | |
52 | + | ||
53 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, pursuant to Article III, § 35 3 | |
54 | + | of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to the salary 4 | |
55 | + | or compensation of a judge of the Orphans’ Court for Dorchester County while serving in a 5 | |
56 | + | term of office beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act 6 | |
57 | + | concerning the salary or compensation of a judge of the Orphans’ Court for Dorchester 7 | |
58 | + | County shall take effect at the beginning of the next following term of office. This limitation 8 | |
59 | + | does not apply to an individual appointed or elected after the effective date of this Act to 9 | |
60 | + | fill out an unexpired term. 10 | |
61 | + | ||
62 | + | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 11 | |
63 | + | October 1, 2022. 12 | |
64 | + | ||
65 | + | ||
66 | + | ||
67 | + | Approved: | |
68 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
69 | + | Governor. | |
70 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
71 | + | President of the Senate. | |
72 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
73 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. |