Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB988 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/29/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0988*  
  
SENATE BILL 988 
N2   	2lr3266 
    	CF HB 1456 
By: Senator Eckardt (By Request – Dorchester County Council) 
Introduced and read first time: February 19, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Judicial Proceedings, February 25, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 16, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Dorchester County – Orphans’ Court – Salary and Expense Allowance of 2 
Orphans’ Court Judges 3 
 
FOR the purpose of increasing the salary and annual expense allowance of a judge of the 4 
Orphans’ Court for Dorchester County; and generally relating to the Orphans’ Court 5 
for Dorchester County.  6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 
 Article – Estates and Trusts 8 
Section 2–108(k) 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 
 
Article – Estates and Trusts 14 
 
2–108. 15 
 
 (k) (1) Each of the judges of the Court for Dorchester County shall receive an 16 
annual salary as determined by the County Council, but not less than [$4,700] $6,000. 17 
  2 	SENATE BILL 988  
 
 
 (2) Each judge shall also receive an expense allowance as determined by 1 
the County Council, but not less than [$800] $1,000 annually. 2 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, pursuant to Article III, § 35 3 
of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to the salary 4 
or compensation of a judge of the Orphans’ Court for Dorchester County while serving in a 5 
term of office beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act 6 
concerning the salary or compensation of a judge of the Orphans’ Court for Dorchester 7 
County shall take effect at the beginning of the next following term of office.  This limitation 8 
does not apply to an individual appointed or elected after the effective date of this Act to 9 
fill out an unexpired term. 10 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 11 
October 1, 2022. 12 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.