House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/20/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |