Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB993 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/29/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0993*  
  
SENATE BILL 993 
D3, L6   	2lr3229 
    	CF HB 1474 
By: Senator Eckardt 
Introduced and read first time: February 20, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Judicial Proceedings, February 28, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 16, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Local Government Tort Claims Act – Definition of Local Government 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the definition of “local government” under the Local 3 
Government Tort Claims Act to include Delmarva Community Services, Inc. and the 4 
Maryland Association of Counties Pooled OPEB Trust Fund; and generally relating 5 
to the Local Government Tort Claims Act. 6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 8 
Section 5–301(d)(28) and (29) 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 
 
BY adding to 12 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 13 
Section 5–301(d)(30) and (31) 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 
 
Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 19 
  2 	SENATE BILL 993  
 
 
5–301. 1 
 
 (d) “Local government” means: 2 
 
 (28) The nonprofit corporation serving as the local public transportation 3 
authority for Garrett County pursuant to a contract or memorandum of understanding with 4 
Garrett County (Garrett County Community Action Committee, Inc.); [and] 5 
 
 (29) The nonprofit corporation serving as the industrial development 6 
authority of Carroll County established under Title 12, Subtitle 1 of the Economic 7 
Development Article; 8 
 
 (30) DELMARVA COMMUNITY SERVICES, INC., IN DORCHESTER 9 
COUNTY; AND 10 
 
 (31) THE MARYLAND ASSOCIATION OF COUNTIES POOLED OPEB 11 
TRUST FUND. 12 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 13 
October 1, 2022. 14 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.