House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283 | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (101-36) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {613127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (99-36) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {143829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/22/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 09/26/2022 | Pre-filed |