Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1134 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *hb1134*
66
77 HOUSE BILL 1134
88 E4 3lr2316
99
1010 By: Delegates Acevero, Bridges, and Ivey
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 10, 2023
1212 Assigned to: Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use and 2
1919 Electric–Ready Standards 3
2020
2121 FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt, on or before a 4
2222 certain date and as part of the Maryland Building Performance Standards, a 5
2323 requirement that new buildings meet all energy demands of the building without the 6
2424 use of fossil fuels and an electric–ready standard for certain buildings; and generally 7
2525 relating to the Maryland Building Performance Standards. 8
2626
2727 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 9
2828 Article – Public Safety 10
2929 Section 12–503 11
3030 Annotated Code of Maryland 12
3131 (2022 Replacement Volume) 13
3232
3333 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14
3434 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15
3535
3636 Article – Public Safety 16
3737
3838 12–503. 17
3939
4040 (a) (1) The Department shall adopt by regulation, as the Maryland Building 18
4141 Performance Standards, the International Building Code, including the International 19
4242 Energy Conservation Code, with the modifications incorporated by the Department under 20
4343 subsection (b) of this section. 21
4444
4545 (2) The Department shall adopt each subsequent version of the Standards 22
4646 within 18 months after it is issued. 23
4747
4848 (b) (1) Before adopting each version of the Standards, the Department shall: 24 2 HOUSE BILL 1134
4949
5050
5151
5252 (i) review the International Building Code to determine whether 1
5353 modifications should be incorporated in the Standards; 2
5454
5555 (ii) consider changes to the International Building Code to enhance 3
5656 energy conservation and efficiency; 4
5757
5858 (iii) subject to the provisions of paragraph (2)(ii) of this subsection, 5
5959 adopt modifications to the Standards that allow any innovative approach, design, 6
6060 equipment, or method of construction that can be demonstrated to offer performance that 7
6161 is at least the equivalent to the requirements of: 8
6262
6363 1. the International Energy Conservation Code; 9
6464
6565 2. Chapter 13, “Energy Efficiency”, of the International 10
6666 Building Code; or 11
6767
6868 3. Chapter 11, “Energy Efficiency”, of the International 12
6969 Residential Code; 13
7070
7171 (iv) accept written comments; 14
7272
7373 (v) consider any comments received; and 15
7474
7575 (vi) hold a public hearing on each proposed modification. 16
7676
7777 (2) (i) Except as provided in subparagraph (ii) of this paragraph, 17
7878 PARAGRAPH (3) OF THIS SUBSECTION , and § 12–510 of this subtitle, the Department 18
7979 may not adopt, as part of the Standards, a modification of a building code requirement that 19
8080 is more stringent than the requirement in the International Building Code. 20
8181
8282 (ii) The Department may adopt energy conservation requirements 21
8383 that are more stringent than the requirements in the International Energy Conservation 22
8484 Code, but may not adopt energy conservation requirements that are less stringent than the 23
8585 requirements in the International Energy Conservation Code. 24
8686
8787 (3) (I) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2024, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL 25
8888 ADOPT, AS PART OF THE STANDARDS: 26
8989
9090 1. SUBJECT TO SUBPARAGR APHS (II) AND (III) OF THIS 27
9191 PARAGRAPH , A REQUIREMENT THAT N EW BUILDINGS MEET AL L ENERGY DEMANDS 28
9292 OF THE BUILDING WITHOUT THE USE OF FOSSIL FUELS; AND 29
9393
9494 2. AN ELECTRIC–READY STANDARD FOR NEW BUILDINGS 30
9595 THAT RECEIVE A WAIVE R UNDER SUBPARAGRAPH (III) OF THIS PARAGRAPH . 31
9696 HOUSE BILL 1134 3
9797
9898
9999 (II) THE REQUIREMENT THAT NEW BUILDINGS MEET ALL 1
100100 ENERGY DEMANDS WITHO UT THE USE OF FOSSIL FUELS UNDER PARAGRAP H (1) OF 2
101101 THIS SUBSECTION SHALL BE MET: 3
102102
103103 1. ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2025, FOR A BUILDING: 4
104104
105105 A. THAT WILL BE LESS THAN SEVEN STORIES TALL; AND 5
106106
107107 B. FOR WHICH A BUILDING PERMIT APPLICATION I S 6
108108 RECEIVED BY A LOCAL JURISDICTION; AND 7
109109
110110 2. ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2029, FOR A BUILDING: 8
111111
112112 A. THAT WILL BE SEVEN OR MORE STORIES TALL; AND 9
113113
114114 B. FOR WHICH A BUILDING PERMIT APPLICATION I S 10
115115 RECEIVED BY A LOCAL JURISDICTION. 11
116116
117117 (III) 1. SUBJECT TO SUBSUBPARA GRAPHS 2 AND 3 OF THIS 12
118118 SUBPARAGRAPH , A LOCAL JURISDICTION M AY GRANT A WAIVER FROM THE 13
119119 REQUIREMENT UNDER SUBPARAGRAPH (I)1 OF THIS PARAGRAPH FO R: 14
120120
121121 A. EMERGENCY BACK –UP POWER SYSTEMS FOR NEW 15
122122 BUILDINGS; AND 16
123123
124124 B. NEW BUILDINGS SPECIFICAL LY DESIGNATED FOR 17
125125 OCCUPANCY BY A COMME RCIAL FOOD ESTABLISHMENT , LABORATORY , 18
126126 LAUNDROMAT , HOSPITAL, OR CREMATORIUM . 19
127127
128128 2. A. A WAIVER GRANTED UNDER 20
129129 SUBSUBPARAGRAPH 1 OF THIS SUBPARAGRAPH SHALL BE LIMITED TO BUILDING 21
130130 SYSTEMS AND AREAS THAT CANNOT FEASIBLY USE ENERGY GENERATED FROM A 22
131131 SOURCE OTHER THAN FOSSIL FUELS. 23
132132
133133 B. FINANCIAL CONSIDERATI ONS ARE NOT A SUFFIC IENT 24
134134 BASIS FOR DETERMININ G FEASIBILITY UNDER SUBSUBSUBPARAGRAPH A OF THIS 25
135135 SUBSUBPARAGRAPH . 26
136136
137137 3. A BUILDING THAT IS GRANTED A WAIVER UNDER 27
138138 SUBSUBPARAGRAPH 1 OF THIS SUBPARAGRAPH SH ALL: 28
139139
140140 A. SEEK TO MINIMIZE EMI SSIONS FROM ITS FOSSIL FUEL 29
141141 USE; 30 4 HOUSE BILL 1134
142142
143143
144144
145145 B. MAXIMIZE HEALTH , SAFETY, AND FIRE PROTECTION ; 1
146146 AND 2
147147
148148 C. BE REQUIRED TO COMPL Y WITH THE 3
149149 ELECTRIC–READY STANDARDS ADOP TED UNDER SUBPARAGRA PH (I)2 OF THIS 4
150150 PARAGRAPH . 5
151151
152152 4. TO ENSURE A WAIVER GRANTED UNDER 6
153153 SUBSUBPARAGRAPH 1 OF THIS SUBPARAGRAPH IS STILL NECESSARY , THE WAVIER 7
154154 SHALL BE REVIEWED: 8
155155
156156 A. EACH TIME THE STANDARDS ARE MODIFIED BY THE 9
157157 DEPARTMENT ; AND 10
158158
159159 B. BY THE LOCAL JURISDI CTION THAT GRANTED T HE 11
160160 WAIVER EACH TIME THE LOCAL JURISDICTION M ODIFIES ITS LOCAL AM ENDMENTS 12
161161 UNDER § 12–504 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 13
162162
163163 (IV) NOTHING IN THIS PARAG RAPH MAY BE CONSTRUE D TO 14
164164 PROHIBIT A LOCAL JUR ISDICTION FROM PROHI BITING THE USE OF FO SSIL FUELS IN 15
165165 BUILDINGS. 16
166166
167167 (c) The Standards apply to each building or structure in the State for which a 17
168168 building permit application is received by a local jurisdiction on or after August 1, 1995. 18
169169
170170 (d) In addition to the Standards, the Department shall: 19
171171
172172 (1) on or before January 1, 2023, adopt by regulation the 2018 20
173173 International Green Construction Code; and 21
174174
175175 (2) adopt each subsequent version of the Code within 18 months after it is 22
176176 issued. 23
177177
178178 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, on or before December 1, 24
179179 2024, the Maryland Department of Labor, in conjunction with the Maryland Energy 25
180180 Administration, the Public Service Commission, and the Department of Housing and 26
181181 Community Development, shall report to the Governor and the General Assembly, in 27
182182 accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, on any policy changes needed 28
183183 to ensure the provisions under § 12–503(b)(3) of the Public Safety Article, as enacted by 29
184184 Section 1 of this Act, do not diminish the availability of affordable housing or the 30
185185 affordability of electricity for customers in all–electric buildings, including changes to: 31
186186
187187 (1) electricity rates and tariff structures; 32
188188 HOUSE BILL 1134 5
189189
190190
191191 (2) laws; 1
192192
193193 (3) policies; 2
194194
195195 (4) regulations; and 3
196196
197197 (5) subsidy programs. 4
198198
199199 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 5
200200 October 1, 2023. 6