Senate | 04/10/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {433226/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 2:25 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |