Senate | 04/10/2023 | Floor Amendment {563421/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {563421/1 (Senator Jennings) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {953823/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {563025/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (125-12) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {893620/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 09/22/2022 | Pre-filed |