Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB20 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/28/2023

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0020*  
  
HOUSE BILL 20 
R2   	3lr0442 
HB 713/22 – ENT 	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Delegates Lehman, Hill, Kaiser, Pena–Melnyk, Ruth, and Toles 
Requested: September 22, 2022 
Introduced and read first time: January 11, 2023 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 25, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Vehicle Laws – Horse Riding – Helmet Requirement for Minors 2 
 
FOR the purpose of prohibiting an adult from allowing certain minors to ride a horse on 3 
certain property unless the minor is wearing a helmet that meets certain standards; 4 
and generally relating to helmet requirements and horse riding.  5 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 
 Article – Transportation 7 
Section 21–104 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 10 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND	, 11 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 
 
Article – Transportation 13 
 
21–104. 14 
 
 (a) Every person riding an animal or driving an animal–drawn vehicle on a 15 
roadway has all the rights granted to and is subject to all the duties required of the driver 16 
of a vehicle by this title, except for those provisions of this title that by their very nature 17 
cannot apply. 18 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 20  
 
 
 (b) (1) Except in Charles, Worcester, and St. Mary’s counties, or as provided 1 
in paragraph (2) of this subsection, a person may not ride an animal or drive an  2 
animal–drawn vehicle on: 3 
 
 (i) Any divided highway where the posted maximum speed limit is 4 
more than 35 miles per hour; or 5 
 
 (ii) Any controlled access highway. 6 
 
 (2) In Anne Arundel County, a person may ride an animal on any part of a 7 
highway described in paragraph (1) of this subsection, other than on its roadway or 8 
shoulder. 9 
 
 (C) (1) IN THIS SUBSECT ION, “HORSE” INCLUDES DONKEYS , MULES, AND 10 
PONIES. 11 
 
 (2) (I) SUBJECT TO SUBPARAGRA PH (II) OF THIS PARAGRAPH , 12 
THIS SUBSECTION APPL IES ONLY TO HORSE RI DING ON: 13 
 
 1. A HIGHWAY; 14 
 
 2. A PUBLIC HORSE–RIDING PATH; OR 15 
 
 3. ANY OTHER PROPERTY OP EN TO THE P UBLIC OR 16 
USED BY THE PUBLIC F OR PEDESTRIAN OR VEH ICULAR TRAFFIC THE GROUNDS OF 17 
A FACILITY FOR WHICH THE PRIMARY PURPOSE IS RECREATIONAL , EDUCATIONAL , 18 
OR COMPETITIVE EQUES TRIAN ACTIVITIES.  19 
 
 (II) THIS SUBSECTION DOES NOT APPLY TO A MINOR WHO IS: 20 
 
 1. PRACTICING FOR OR COM PETING OR PERFORMING IN 21 
A SHOW OR EVENT WHER E HELMETS ARE NOT HI STORICALLY PART OF T HE SHOW OR 22 
EVENT;  23 
 
 2. CROSSING A PUBLIC HIG HWAY THAT SEPARATES 24 
PRIVATELY OWNED LAND ;  25 
 
 3. ENGAGED IN AN AGRICUL TURAL PRACTICE OR 26 
PURSUIT; OR 27 
 
 4. A MEMBER OF AN AMISH OR A MENNONITE 28 
COMMUNITY .  29 
 
 (3) AN ADULT WHO IS PRESE NT AND DIRECTLY SUPE RVISING A 30 
MINOR MAY NOT ALLOW THE MINOR TO RIDE A HORSE UNLESS THE MIN OR IS 31   	HOUSE BILL 20 	3 
 
 
WEARING A PROPERLY S ECURED HELMET THAT M EETS OR EXCEEDS THE 1 
STANDARDS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF TESTING AND MATERIALS FOR 2 
PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR USED IN EQUESTRIAN R IDING. 3 
 
 (4) A VIOLATION OF THIS SU BSECTION INVOLVING A N ADULT 4 
SUPERVISING MULTIPLE MINORS AT THE SAME T IME SHALL BE TREATED AS A 5 
SINGLE VIOLATION .  6 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 7 
October 1, 2023.  8 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.