House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {603726/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |