House
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion to Withdraw Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Feldman) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Feldman) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stewart, Davis and Nawrocki)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {373327/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {203120/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
First Reading Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2022
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|