House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (33-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (127-5) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Fisher) Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |