House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {163929/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {693729/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |