House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381 | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {693029/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {373021/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters | ||
House | 07/25/2022 | Pre-filed |