House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-3) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate Adams) Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {703029/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |