1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *hb0889* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | HOUSE BILL 889 |
---|
8 | 8 | | C2, Q1 3lr2796 |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Delegate Ruth |
---|
11 | 11 | | Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Assigned to: Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Retail Service Stations – Electric Vehicle Charging Stations and Property Tax 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Credit for Service Station Conversions 3 |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | FOR the purpose of requiring, for the approval of a new retail service station on or after a 4 |
---|
22 | 22 | | certain date, the person constructing the station to install at the station a certain 5 |
---|
23 | 23 | | number of electric vehicle charging stations; authorizing the Mayor and City Council 6 |
---|
24 | 24 | | of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, 7 |
---|
25 | 25 | | by law, a credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on 8 |
---|
26 | 26 | | real property if use of the real property has been converted from a retail service 9 |
---|
27 | 27 | | station to other certain uses; requiring the State to pay to each county or municipal 10 |
---|
28 | 28 | | corporation that grants the property tax credit under this Act an amount equal to a 11 |
---|
29 | 29 | | certain percentage of certain foregone revenue of the county or municipal 12 |
---|
30 | 30 | | corporation; and generally relating to retail service stations. 13 |
---|
31 | 31 | | |
---|
32 | 32 | | BY adding to 14 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Article – Business Regulation 15 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Section 10–504 16 |
---|
35 | 35 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 17 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2015 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 18 |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | BY adding to 19 |
---|
39 | 39 | | Article – Tax – Property 20 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Section 9–268 21 |
---|
41 | 41 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 22 |
---|
42 | 42 | | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 23 |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 24 |
---|
45 | 45 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 25 |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | Article – Business Regulation 26 |
---|
48 | 48 | | 2 HOUSE BILL 889 |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | 10–504. 1 |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 2 |
---|
54 | 54 | | INDICATED. 3 |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | (2) “APPROVING BODY ” MEANS A COUNTY OR MUNICIPALITY THAT 4 |
---|
57 | 57 | | EXERCISES FINAL CONS TRUCTION APPROVAL AU THORITY FOR RETAIL S ERVICE 5 |
---|
58 | 58 | | STATIONS. 6 |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | (3) “ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHAR GING STATION ” HAS THE MEANING 7 |
---|
61 | 61 | | STATED IN § 12–205 OF THE PUBLIC SAFETY ARTICLE. 8 |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | (4) “FAST CHARGING ” MEANS DIRECT CURRENT CHARGING THAT 9 |
---|
64 | 64 | | CAN PROVIDE A MINIMU M OF 150 KILOWATTS OF POWER T O AN ELECTRIC VEHICL E. 10 |
---|
65 | 65 | | |
---|
66 | 66 | | (5) “FINAL CONSTRUCTION AP PROVAL” MEANS FINAL APPROVAL BY 11 |
---|
67 | 67 | | AN APPROVING BODY TO CONSTRUCT A RETAIL S ERVICE STATION . 12 |
---|
68 | 68 | | |
---|
69 | 69 | | (B) THIS SECTION DOES NOT APPLY TO A RETAIL SE RVICE STATION THAT 13 |
---|
70 | 70 | | RECEIVED FINAL CONST RUCTION APPROVAL FRO M AN APPROVING BODY BEFORE 14 |
---|
71 | 71 | | OCTOBER 1, 2023. 15 |
---|
72 | 72 | | |
---|
73 | 73 | | (C) (1) ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2023, A PERSON CONSTRUCTIN G A 16 |
---|
74 | 74 | | RETAIL SERVICE STATI ON THAT IS PROJECTED TO SELL MORE THAN 1,000,000 17 |
---|
75 | 75 | | GALLONS OF GASOLINE PER YEAR SHALL INSTA LL ONE ELECTRIC VEHI CLE 18 |
---|
76 | 76 | | CHARGING STATION CAP ABLE OF PROVIDING FAST CHARGING FOR EACH GASOLINE 19 |
---|
77 | 77 | | DISPENSER OPERATED BY THE RETA IL SERVICE STATION . 20 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | (2) THE INSTALLATION OF A N ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING 21 |
---|
80 | 80 | | STATION REQUIRED UND ER THIS SUBSECTION M UST BE PERFORMED BY AN 22 |
---|
81 | 81 | | INDIVIDUAL WHO IS CE RTIFIED BY THE ELECTRIC VEHICLE INFRASTRUCTURE 23 |
---|
82 | 82 | | TRAINING PROGRAM TO INSTALL EL ECTRIC VEHICLE SUPPL Y EQUIPMENT. 24 |
---|
83 | 83 | | |
---|
84 | 84 | | (D) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2024, EACH APPROVING BOD Y SHALL 25 |
---|
85 | 85 | | ADOPT REGULATIONS TO CARRY OUT THIS SECTI ON. 26 |
---|
86 | 86 | | |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 27 |
---|
88 | 88 | | as follows: 28 |
---|
89 | 89 | | |
---|
90 | 90 | | Article – Tax – Property 29 |
---|
91 | 91 | | |
---|
92 | 92 | | 9–268. 30 |
---|
93 | 93 | | HOUSE BILL 889 3 |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 1 |
---|
97 | 97 | | INDICATED. 2 |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | (2) “DISCOUNT STORE ” MEANS A RETAIL STORE THAT OFFERS FOR 3 |
---|
100 | 100 | | SALE: 4 |
---|
101 | 101 | | |
---|
102 | 102 | | (I) A COMBINATION AND VA RIETY OF CONVENIENCE AND 5 |
---|
103 | 103 | | CONSUMER SHOPPING GO ODS; AND 6 |
---|
104 | 104 | | |
---|
105 | 105 | | (II) THE MAJORITY OF THE ITEMS IN THE INVENTO RY AT A 7 |
---|
106 | 106 | | PRICE NOT TO EXCEED $5. 8 |
---|
107 | 107 | | |
---|
108 | 108 | | (3) “RETAIL USE” DOES NOT INCLUDE USE AS A DISCOUNT ST ORE OR 9 |
---|
109 | 109 | | A SELF–SERVICE STORAGE FACI LITY. 10 |
---|
110 | 110 | | |
---|
111 | 111 | | (B) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 11 |
---|
112 | 112 | | GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATION MAY GRAN T, BY LAW, 12 |
---|
113 | 113 | | A PROPERTY TAX CREDI T UNDER THIS SECTION AGAINST THE COUNTY O R 13 |
---|
114 | 114 | | MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N PROPERTY TAX IMPOS ED ON REAL PROPERTY IF THE USE 14 |
---|
115 | 115 | | OF THE REAL PROPERTY HAS BEEN CONVERTED F ROM A RETAIL SERVICE STATI ON 15 |
---|
116 | 116 | | TO ANOTHER RETAIL US E, A RESIDENTIAL USE , OR A MIXED RETAIL AND 16 |
---|
117 | 117 | | RESIDENTIAL USE . 17 |
---|
118 | 118 | | |
---|
119 | 119 | | (C) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL O F BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 18 |
---|
120 | 120 | | GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATION MAY PROV IDE, BY 19 |
---|
121 | 121 | | LAW, FOR: 20 |
---|
122 | 122 | | |
---|
123 | 123 | | (1) THE AMOUNT AND DURAT ION OF THE TAX CREDI T UNDER THIS 21 |
---|
124 | 124 | | SECTION; 22 |
---|
125 | 125 | | |
---|
126 | 126 | | (2) ADDITIONAL ELIGIBILI TY CRITERIA FOR THE TAX CREDIT; 23 |
---|
127 | 127 | | |
---|
128 | 128 | | (3) REGULATIONS AND PRO CEDURES FOR THE APPL ICATION AND 24 |
---|
129 | 129 | | UNIFORM PROCESSING O F REQUESTS FOR THE T AX CREDIT; AND 25 |
---|
130 | 130 | | |
---|
131 | 131 | | (4) ANY OTHER PROVISION NECESSARY TO CARRY O UT THE TAX 26 |
---|
132 | 132 | | CREDIT UNDER THIS SE CTION. 27 |
---|
133 | 133 | | |
---|
134 | 134 | | (D) AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET , THE STATE SHALL PAY TO EACH 28 |
---|
135 | 135 | | COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N THAT GRANTS THE TAX CREDIT UNDER THIS 29 |
---|
136 | 136 | | SECTION AN AMOUNT EQUAL TO 50% OF THE PROPERTY TAX REVENUE THAT WOULD 30 |
---|
137 | 137 | | HAVE BEEN COLLECTED IF THE TAX CREDIT UN DER THIS SECTION HAD NOT BEEN 31 |
---|
138 | 138 | | GRANTED. 32 4 HOUSE BILL 889 |
---|
139 | 139 | | |
---|
140 | 140 | | |
---|
141 | 141 | | |
---|
142 | 142 | | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Se ction 2 of this Act shall be 1 |
---|
143 | 143 | | applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2023. 2 |
---|
144 | 144 | | |
---|
145 | 145 | | SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall take 3 |
---|
146 | 146 | | effect October 1, 2023. 4 |
---|
147 | 147 | | |
---|
148 | 148 | | SECTION 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , except as provided in Section 5 |
---|
149 | 149 | | 4 of this Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2023. 6 |
---|